Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste-Léon Gouzot

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1827Born
23 Nov 185124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Périgueux, France
28 Nov 188356.7SelectedBishop of Gap, France
27 Mar 188457.0ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
2 Jun 188457.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
25 Jun 188457.3InstalledBishop of Gap, France
2 May 188760.1SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
26 May 188760.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
4 Aug 188760.4InstalledArchbishop of Auch, France
20 Aug 189568.4DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste-Léon Gouzot (VIAF: 49321723)
Archbishop Louis-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste-Léon Gouzot (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaleyrac
Ordained BishopCathedral, Périgueux, Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 135, and Page 582
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,884, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast