Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Christian-Ernest Cardinal Bourret, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1827Born
20 Sep 185123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
10 Aug 187143.6SelectedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
27 Oct 187143.8ConfirmedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
30 Nov 187143.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
12 Jun 189365.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189466.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
10 Jul 189668.5DiedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Christian-Ernest Bourret (VIAF: 49393647)
Joseph-Christian-Ernest Cardinal Bourret C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLubro, Diocese of Viviers
Ordained PriestParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSt. Sulpice, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceRodez, Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rodez, Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 489, and Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1893
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017