Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Antoine-Marie-Ambroise-Benjamin Baduel

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1818Born
21 Sep 184425.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 187758.5SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
21 Sep 187758.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
21 Nov 187758.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
7 Dec 187759.0InstalledBishop of Saint-Flour, France
16 May 189172.4DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for François-Antoine-Marie-Ambroise-Benjamin Baduel (VIAF: 27084015)
Bishop François-Antoine-Marie-Ambroise-Benjamin Baduel (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaguiole
Ordained BishopVillefranche du Rouergue

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017