Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien Costes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1819Born
1 Jun 184424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rodez, France
23 Mar 187656.4SelectedBishop of Mende, France
26 Jun 187656.6ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
3 Sep 187656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
27 Apr 1889³69.5ResignedBishop of Mende, France
8 Aug 189070.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mende, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julien Costes (VIAF: 39368300)
Bishop Julien Costes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavignac
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rodez, Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017