Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien Vidal, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fiji Island

Titular Bishop of Abydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1846BornVillecomtal, France
8 Dec 186923.4ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
13 May 188740.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fiji Island, Pacific (Oceania)
13 May 188740.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
27 Dec 188741.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
Jul 189751.0AppointedPrefect of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
190356.5ResignedPrefect of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
2 Apr 192275.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Fiji Island, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Julien Vidal:
Bishop Julien Vidal S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fiji Island

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 71
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013