Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Jean Broyer, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Polemonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1846Born
15 Jul 187428.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
30 Mar 189650.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Mar 189650.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Polemonium
25 Oct 189650.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polemonium
29 Oct 191872.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Pierre Jean Broyer
Bishop Pierre Jean Broyer S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlliat, France
Ordained BishopFourviere, Basilica, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 461
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017