Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Michel-Frédéric Bonnet

Deceased

Bishop of Viviers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1835Born
17 Dec 185924.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 187640.7SelectedBishop of Viviers, France
26 Jun 187640.7ConfirmedBishop of Viviers, France
24 Aug 187640.9Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
21 May 192387.6DiedBishop of Viviers, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Michel-Frédéric Bonnet (VIAF: 2430)
Bishop Joseph-Michel-Frédéric Bonnet (born , died ) Bishop of Viviers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangogne
Ordained BishopPérigueux, Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 594
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017