Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Amand Lamaze, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga

Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1833Born
1 May 185724.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 186229.4ProfessedPriest of Society of Mary
23 May 187946.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
23 May 187946.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
23 May 187946.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
21 Dec 187946.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
189662.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
9 Sep 190673.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga

MicroData Summary for Jean-Amand Lamaze
Bishop Jean-Amand Lamaze S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Michel-sur-Meurthe, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 425
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017