Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Antoine Jauffret

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1833BornLa Ciotat
22 Sep 186026.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 188956.0SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
30 Dec 188956.1ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
9 Mar 189056.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
16 Jun 190268.5DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

MicroData Summary for François-Antoine Jauffret:
Bishop François-Antoine Jauffret (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013