Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne-Joseph-Frédéric Tanoux

Deceased

Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1842BornAubagne, France
22 Dec 186624.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 189855.3SelectedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
24 Mar 189855.4ConfirmedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
12 Jun 189855.6Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
22 Nov 189957.1DiedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Étienne-Joseph-Frédéric Tanoux:
Bishop Étienne-Joseph-Frédéric Tanoux (born , died ) Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013