Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Hazera

Deceased

Bishop of Digne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1837BornPodensac
20 Dec 186226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux, France
14 Apr 189760.3SelectedBishop of Digne, France
19 Apr 189760.3ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
5 Sep 189760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
17 Jun 190568.5DiedBishop of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Hazera:
Bishop Jean Hazera (born , died ) Bishop of Digne

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013