Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloys-Joseph-Eugène Arnaud

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1834Born
27 Jun 185823.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 189965.2SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
14 Dec 189965.2ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
18 Feb 190065.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
20 Feb 190065.4InstalledBishop of Fréjus, France
17 Jun 190570.7DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Aloys-Joseph-Eugène Arnaud
Bishop Aloys-Joseph-Eugène Arnaud (born , died ) Bishop of Fréjus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoquevaire

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast