Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Coldefy

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1826Born
14 Jun 185124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Périgueux, France
17 Feb 188154.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
13 May 188154.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
3 Jul 188154.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
18 Jan 188760.1DiedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for Joseph Coldefy
Bishop Joseph Coldefy (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontfaucon-du-Lot, France
Ordained BishopDordogne, Thiviers

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018