Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Jean-François-Paulin Delannoy

Deceased

Bishop of Aire et Dax


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1824BornTempleuve
22 Dec 184925.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 187247.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
6 May 187247.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
12 Oct 187248.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
21 Oct 187652.3SelectedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
18 Dec 187652.5ConfirmedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
7 Aug 190581.1DiedBishop of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Victor-Jean-François-Paulin Delannoy:
Bishop Victor-Jean-François-Paulin Delannoy (born , died ) Bishop of Aire et Dax

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 130, and Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013