Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Belleville, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Amisus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1860BornChavanod, France
16 Sep 188222.7ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 Jul 188424.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Feb 191151.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
9 Feb 191151.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
4 Jun 191151.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
7 Jul 191252.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for François Belleville:
Bishop François Belleville M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013