Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Monnier

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1820Born
23 Dec 184323.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187252.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
23 Feb 187252.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
1 May 187252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
28 Nov 191696.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Monnier (VIAF: 31987761)
Bishop Henri Monnier (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNivelles
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cambrai, Archdiocese of Cambrai

  • a priest for 72.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017