Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph Lequette

Deceased

Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1811Born
13 Jun 183523.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 186654.8SelectedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
22 Jun 186654.9ConfirmedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
6 Aug 186655.1Ordained BishopBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
13 Jun 188270.9DiedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Joseph Lequette (VIAF: 39688713)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph Lequette (born , died ) Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBapaume
Ordained BishopCathedral, Arras, Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017