Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Désiré-César Bataille

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1820Born
21 Dec 184424.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 187352.8SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
25 Jul 187352.9ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
21 Sep 187353.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
25 Sep 187353.0InstalledBishop of Amiens, France
9 Jun 187958.7DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Désiré-César Bataille (VIAF: 54141318)
Bishop Louis-Désiré-César Bataille (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHouplines-sur-la-Lys
Ordained BishopSt. Jacques, Douai

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,873, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast