Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Thierry Obré

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1806Born
28 May 183124.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 187771.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
14 Dec 187771.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
15 Jan 187871.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
28 Feb 187871.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
14 Dec 188175.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Thierry Obré
Bishop Claude-Thierry Obré (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCroissy-Sur-Celle
Ordained BishopCathedral, Beauvais, Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018