Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Désiré-Joseph Dennel

Deceased

Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1822Born
20 Dec 184523.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 188057.7SelectedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
27 Feb 188057.8ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
1 May 188057.9Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
10 Jul 188462.1SelectedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
13 Nov 188462.5ConfirmedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
28 Oct 189169.4DiedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Désiré-Joseph Dennel (VIAF: 69264439)
Bishop Désiré-Joseph Dennel (born , died ) Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMons-en-Pévèle
Ordained BishopSt Andre, Lille, Archdiocese of Cambrai

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 129, and Page 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017