Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clovis-Nicolas-Joseph Catteau

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1836Born
21 Dec 186125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
25 Aug 187741.4SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
21 Sep 187741.5ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
21 Nov 187741.6Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
28 Nov 191579.6DiedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Clovis-Nicolas-Joseph Catteau (VIAF: 259857392)
Bishop Clovis-Nicolas-Joseph Catteau (born , died ) Bishop of Luçon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSains-les-Marquion
Ordained BishopCathedral, Luçon, Diocese of Luçon

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017