Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile-Louis-Cornil Lobbedey

Deceased

Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1856Born
10 Aug 187822.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 190650.4AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
26 Aug 190650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
5 May 191155.1AppointedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
24 Dec 191660.8DiedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Emile-Louis-Cornil Lobbedey
Bishop Emile-Louis-Cornil Lobbedey (born , died ) Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergues

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast