Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin-Fernand Leynaud

Deceased

Archbishop of Alger, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1865Born
24 Jun 188822.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 191751.3AppointedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
6 Mar 191751.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
5 Aug 195387.9DiedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Fernand Leynaud (VIAF: 66539814)
Archbishop Augustin-Fernand Leynaud (born , died ) Archbishop of Alger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Ollières sur Eyrieux, France

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • bp: CB, 23 Dec 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 47
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1917, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast