Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Piquemal

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Alger, Algeria

Titular Bishop of Thagora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1852Born
1874¹21.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 190956.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alger, Algeria
26 Feb 190956.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagora
25 Mar 190957.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagora
4 Jun 192068.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Alger, Algeria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Piquemal
Bishop Alexandre Piquemal (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Alger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMirepoix, France

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017