Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Alexandre-Léon Bouissière

Deceased

Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1860BornSaint-Amans-Valtoret, France
7 Jun 188424.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 191353.2AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
2 Jul 191353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
10 Sep 191656.4DiedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Jules-Alexandre-Léon Bouissière:
Bishop Jules-Alexandre-Léon Bouissière (born , died ) Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone)

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013