Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Firmin Capmartin

Deceased

Bishop of Oran, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1855Born
20 Dec 187924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux, France
19 Feb 191155.5AppointedBishop of Oran, Algeria
18 Apr 191155.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
25 Dec 191459.4DiedBishop of Oran, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Firmin Capmartin
Bishop Pierre-Firmin Capmartin (born , died ) Bishop of Oran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCenon, France

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017