Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-François-Xavier Métreau

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1856Born
15 Jan 191255.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tours, France
15 Jan 191255.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
19 Mar 191255.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
6 Aug 191357.3AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
24 Apr 191862.0DiedBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-François-Xavier Métreau
Bishop Joseph-Marie-François-Xavier Métreau (born , died ) Bishop of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast