Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Magloire-Désiré Barthet, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Senegambia, Senegal

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1837Born
5 Apr 186225.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 186225.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
30 Jul 188952.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
30 Jul 188952.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
15 Sep 188952.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
15 Dec 189861.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
30 Oct 191275.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Senegambia, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Magloire-Désiré Barthet (VIAF: 316490116)
Bishop Magloire-Désiré Barthet C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Senegambia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePicarreau, France
Ordained BishopSpiritains Chapel, rue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux, France

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017