Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Louis Genoud, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe

Titular Bishop of Apollonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1860BornDouvaine, France
1 Nov 188525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
31 May 191252.2AppointedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
2 Jul 191252.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
17 May 194585.1RetiredBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
17 May 194585.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
15 Oct 194585.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Louis Genoud:
Bishop Pierre-Louis Genoud C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013