Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Louis-Joseph Lequien, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1872Born
1 Jan 189825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Mar 191542.5AppointedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
22 Jul 191542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
5 Jan 194168.3DiedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles

MicroData Summary for Paul-Louis-Joseph Lequien
Bishop Paul-Louis-Joseph Lequien C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMerville, France

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018