Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Schelfhaut, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1850Born
5 Oct 187323.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Oct 187828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Jan 190251.3AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
16 Mar 190251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
22 May 192170.6DiedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Philip Schelfhaut
Bishop Philip Schelfhaut C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Roseau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSint-Niklaas-Waas, Belgium

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018