Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Compton Theodore Galton, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana

Titular Bishop of Petinessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1855BornWorcester, Great Britain
21 Sep 189034.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 May 190246.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
9 May 190246.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Petinessus
19 Oct 190246.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petinessus
10 Apr 193175.3DiedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Compton Theodore Galton
Bishop Compton Theodore Galton S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of British Guiana

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Feb 2016