Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Menzies Gordon, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1831Born
1878²46.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 May 188958.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
28 May 188958.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
15 Aug 188958.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
11 Jan 190674.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
16 Nov 191180.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Menzies Gordon
Bishop Charles Menzies Gordon S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlenlivet, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSt Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 552
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018