Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Smith

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1819Born
15 Apr 184323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Oct 188566.2AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Oct 188566.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Mar 189272.7DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Smith
Archbishop William Smith (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdinburgh, Lothian, Vicariate Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Death PlaceSt. Bennet's (Archbishop's House), Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 59
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast