Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Petre Eyre

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1817Born
19 Mar 184224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
3 Dec 186851.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Scotland
11 Dec 186851.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
31 Jan 186951.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
16 Apr 186951.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Mar 187860.3AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
27 Mar 190284.3DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles Petre Eyre (VIAF: 5319084)
Archbishop Charles Petre Eyre (born , died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAskam Bryan Hall, York, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Andre della Valle, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, Hillhead, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)College Chapel, St. Peter, Seminary, Cardross, Dumbarton, Dunbartonshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Current)St. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98, and Page 287
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 6
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast