Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

Archidioecesis Sancti Andreae et Edimburgensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 March 1878
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Scotland
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 5,504 (2,125 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdiocese-edinburgh.com/
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Offices, Gillis Centre, 100 Strathearn Road, Edinburgh EH9 1BB, Scotland, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (0131)623-8900
  • Fax: 623-8899

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Scotland
13 October 1653ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Scotland (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Scotland
16 March 1694ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Scotland Vicariate Apostolic of Scotland
23 July 1727Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Scotland Vicariate Apostolic of Highland District (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lowland District
23 July 1727Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Scotland Vicariate Apostolic of Lowland District
13 February 1827Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Lowland District Vicariate Apostolic of Western District (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern District
13 February 1827Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Lowland District Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern District
Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh
4 March 1878ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern District Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh
194995,157600,00015.9%167762433917835374ap1951
1969126,0001,339,4729.4%1768626248016140599ap1971
1980130,0001,377,0009.4%16573238546113371111ap1981
1990120,5601,413,0008.5%1315919063483263100ap1991
1999112,6521,356,0008.3%1164916568216217795ap2000
2000112,6521,360,0008.3%1145216667816418094ap2001
2001112,5901,365,0008.2%1145216667816217194ap2002
2002112,8851,392,3008.1%10947156723159166108ap2003
2003112,2001,420,1467.9%10742149753153162108ap2004
2004112,9781,434,3477.9%9936135836146157106ap2005
2010115,0901,510,5407.6%9644140822450109113ap2011
2012115,9001,533,0007.6%764412096545293113ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013