Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kennedy

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jul 1437AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
28 May 1440AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
10 May 1465DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Kennedy
Bishop James Kennedy (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 88, and Page 147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Nov 2020

Quantcast