Catholic-Hierarchy DC

David Cardinal Beaton

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Bishop of Mirepoix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1494¹Born
1537¹43.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Dec 153743.9AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
Aug 1538²44.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
20 Dec 153844.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 153945.1SucceededArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Sep 153945.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
29 May 154652.4DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David Beaton (VIAF: 20477398)
David Cardinal Beaton (born 1494, died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFife, Scotland
Death PlaceCastle, Saint Andrews, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Sea Tower of the Castle, Saint Andrews, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews, Scotland

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 108, and Page 246
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast