Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Turner

Deceased

Bishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1844Born
26 Apr 186823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Jun 189348.5AppointedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Jul 189348.6Ordained BishopBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Jan 191469.1DiedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Turner
Bishop William Turner (born , died ) Bishop of Galloway

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAberdeen, City of Aberdeen, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Pro-Cathedral, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Holy Cross, Cemetery, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 50
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast