Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angus MacFarlane

Deceased

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1843Born
26 Apr 186825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Feb 190158.1AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
1 May 190158.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Sep 191269.7DiedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Angus MacFarlane
Bishop Angus MacFarlane (born , died ) Bishop of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpean Bridge, Inverness-shire, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Balgay, Cemetery, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 12
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast