Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aeneas Chisholm

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1836Born
1 May 185922.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
15 May 185922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Jan 189962.5AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Feb 189962.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Jan 191881.5DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Aeneas Chisholm
Bishop Aeneas Chisholm (born , died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInverness
Ordained BishopCathedral, Aberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Death PlaceEdinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's College, Cemetery, Blairs, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69
  • opd: CB, 11 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017