Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Bane (Bennet)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1328Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
1 Aug 1328AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Sep 1332DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Bane (Bennet)
Bishop James Bane (Bennet) (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 89
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast