Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William de Landalis

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Feb 1342AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
17 Mar 1342Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Oct 1385DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William de Landalis
Bishop William de Landalis (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 89
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 May 2019

Quantcast