Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal des Prés

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1280¹BornMontpezat
31 Mar 131838.2AppointedBishop of Riez, France
7 May 131838.3Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
11 Sep 131838.7AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
20 Dec 132041.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 1321³41.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
25 May 132343.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
16 May 136181.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre des Prés:
Cardinal Pierre des Prés (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 43.0 years
  • a cardinal for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1320
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014