Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petrus Torkilsson

Deceased

Archbishop of Uppsala, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1342AppointedBishop of Linköping, Sweden
17 Mar 1342Ordained BishopBishop of Linköping, Sweden
17 Nov 1351AppointedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
18 Oct 1366DiedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Petrus Torkilsson
Archbishop Petrus Torkilsson (died ) Archbishop of Uppsala

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 508, and Page 306
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 28 May 2019

Quantcast