Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Peyssoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1341AppointedBishop of Digne, France
17 Mar 1342Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
2 Aug 1361AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
10 Oct 1368DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Peyssoni
Archbishop Jean Peyssoni (died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 224, and Page 96
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 May 2019

Quantcast