Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Przecław z Pogorzeli

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1310Born
28 Jan 134231.7AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
17 Mar 134231.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
5 Apr 1376³65.9DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Przecław z Pogorzeli
Bishop Przecław z Pogorzeli (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 34.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,143
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,396
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast