Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej z Golańczy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1323AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
8 Jan 1324Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
1364¹ResignedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
16 May 1368DiedBishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej z Golańczy
Bishop Maciej z Golańczy (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 534
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,187
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,141
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Jul 2020

Quantcast