Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berthold von Zollern

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1320¹Born
20 May 135131.3AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
4 Jun 135131.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jun 135131.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 135131.4Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
16 Sep 136545.7DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Berthold von Zollern (VIAF: 30722603)
Bishop Berthold von Zollern (born 1320, died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNürnberg
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a priest for 14.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • b/c02: CB, 2 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast