Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ranald MacDonald

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Arindela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1756¹BornEdinburgh
1782²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 181963.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
27 Aug 181963.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
25 Feb 182064.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
13 Feb 182771.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
20 Sep 183276.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ranald MacDonald
Bishop Ranald MacDonald (born 1756, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western District

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 89
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016